Yang, Peter Sihan (CPSO#: 98094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tiffany Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yang ( CPSO# 98094 )
Dr. T. Lo ( CPSO# 98142 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 435-0111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER SIHAN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017