Yang, Robert Chen-Hui (CPSO#: 75200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Marian Wing
Nephrology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33323
Fax: (905) 521-6088
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Robert Yang & Deborah Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lee ( CPSO# 80969 )
Dr. R. Yang ( CPSO# 75200 )

Business Address:
Suite 18
1960 Appleby Road
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 319-2000

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Nephrology - Marian Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CHEN-HUI YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004