Yang, Tung Chuo (CPSO#: 64311)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Japanese

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Oct 1997