Yao, James Ka-Ying (CPSO#: 21430)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Filipino

Education:University of the Philippines, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records should contact: St. Michael's Hospital Medical Records Department 30 Bond Street Toronto, ON M5B 1W8 Tel: (416) 360-4000
Date Received: 24 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1959
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013