Yao, Louis Charn Hwa (CPSO#: 32621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1920 Weston Road
Suite 230
Toronto ON  M9N 1W4
Phone: (416) 241-1119
Fax: (416) 241-2623
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS CHARN HWA YAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986