Yao, Shengtao (CPSO#: 82033)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shandong, Binzhou Medical College, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Nov 2004 to 18 Dec 2004
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2004 to 10 Jan 2005
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2005 to 04 Feb 2005
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2005