Yao, Yue (CPSO#: 98917)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Xiangya School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016