Yap, Audrey Poh Geck (CPSO#: 77754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Health
Outpatient Clinic
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: 416-461-8252 Ext. 2933
Fax: 416-461-2089
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lyndhurst Centre - UHN
520 Sutherland Dr.
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Canada
Phone: 416-597-3422 Ext. 6097
Fax: 416-597-7042
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Audrey Yap Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yap ( CPSO# 77754 )

Business Address:
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUDREY POH GECK YAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2007