Yap, David Tong Tien (CPSO#: 76348)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2004