Yarascavitch, Alec James (CPSO#: 93303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: (705) 645-4404
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Canada
Phone: 705-474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N5A9
Canada
Phone: 613-969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEC JAMES YARASCAVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YARASCAVITCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012