Yarascavitch, Blake Arden (CPSO#: 88552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75237
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BLAKE ARDEN YARASCAVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YARASCAVITCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2015