Yaroshevsky, Felix (CPSO#: 32567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1981

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:First Leningrad Medical Institute, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 808
920 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4W 3C7
Phone: (416) 934-0888
Fax: (416) 431-1710
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FELIX YAROSHEVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAROSHEVSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1981
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 15 Jun 2007

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Mar 2007
Summary:

 On March 1, 2007, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Felix Yaroshevsky committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in 
 conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional. 

The Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Yaroshevsky(s 
 certificate of registration for a period of five (5) months commencing March 15, 2007, two (2) 
 months of which shall be suspended if Dr. Yaroshevsky successfully completes, at his own expense, 
 the College(s Boundaries Course and provides proof thereof to the College.

The Discipline 
 Committee orders Dr. Yaroshevsky to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 01, 2007