Yasin, Nasif Ibrahim (CPSO#: 55971)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Garyounis University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 07 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 1992