Yassa, Naguib Helmy (CPSO#: 74273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131 Ext. 7257
Fax: 416-281-7486
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 St Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON  K1K 3B8
Canada
Phone: 613-288-2200
Fax: (416) 281-7486
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naguib Yassa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Yassa ( CPSO# 74273 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Suite 1016
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
1200 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1K 3B8
Phone Number: (613) 288-2200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 02 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 29 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAGUIB HELMY YASSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASSA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1999