Yassa, Teraiza Soltan Saad (CPSO#: 69290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nephrology & Internal Medicine
The Court Centenary Hospital
Suite 319
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 281-3336
Fax: (416) 281-8385
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teraiza Yassa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Yassa ( CPSO# 69290 )

Business Address:
Nephrology & Internal Medicine
The Court Centenary Hospital
319 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 281-3336

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERAIZA SOLTAN SAAD YASSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000