Yassein, Hossam (CPSO#: 57208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J5
Phone: (905) 434-1694
Fax: (905) 434-6308
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yassein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yassein ( CPSO# 57208 )

Business Address:
201 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 434-1694

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOSSAM YASSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASSEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1987