Yassin, Asma'a Abdul Rahman (CPSO#: 86987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 The Board Walk
Kitchener ON  N2N0B4
Phone: (519) 2794098
Fax: (519) 2794099
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASMA'A ABDUL RAHMAN YASSIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASSIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2015