Yates, Derrick Anthony (CPSO#: 79250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
299 Main Street North
Callander ON  P0H 1H0
Phone: (705) 752-1004
Fax: (705) 752-4507
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Dr.
P1B 5A4
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 2159
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derrick Yates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yates ( CPSO# 79250 )

Business Address:
299 Main Street North
Callander ON  P0H 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 752-1004

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mattawa General Hospital Mattawa
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DERRICK ANTHONY YATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YATES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005