Yatham, Lakshmi Narayana (CPSO#: 62953)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Sri Venkatesvara University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2003