Yathindra, Yashi Kala (CPSO#: 88878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6882
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yashi K. Yathindra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Yathindra ( CPSO# 88878 )

Business Address:
Extendicare Scarborough
3830 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1G 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 439-1243

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASHI KALA YATHINDRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YATHINDRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2011