Yau, Ivan Hai-Yun (CPSO#: 100788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Advanced Access Medical Clinics
Unit 7
3091 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 4R9
Phone: (613) 825-5995
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ivan Yau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Yau ( CPSO# 100788)

Business Address:
Advanced Access Medical Clinics
Unit 7
3091 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 4R9
Phone Number: (613) 825-5995

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVAN HAI-YUN YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015