Yau, Yvonne Chi Wan (CPSO#: 60765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Room 36-100
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 203478
Fax: (416) 813-6257
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVONNE CHI WAN YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1990