Yazdan-Ashoori, Payam (CPSO#: 97716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aliyarzadeh & Yazdan-Ashoori Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Aliyarzadeh ( CPSO# 97734 )
Dr. P. Yazdan-Ashoori ( CPSO# 97716 )

Business Address:
333 Sherbourne Avenue
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone Number: (416) 324-4180

Business Address:
Unit 9
4646 Dufferin Street
North York ON  M3H 5S4

Business Address:
123 Edward Street
Suite 400
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAYAM YAZDAN-ASHOORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDAN-ASHOORI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016