Yazdanfar, Behnaz (CPSO#: 67947)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Mar 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2011
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 21 Dec 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Mar 2014

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 May 2014
Summary:

On May 26, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Yazdanfar committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, 
and that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine 
that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. 
Yazdanfar is incompetent with respect to her care of Patient A. Dr. Yazdanfar admitted to the 
allegations. 
 
With respect to Patient A, in August 2009, the College received a letter of complaint about two 
liposuction procedures performed on her by Dr. Yazdanfar in February and April 2008. Dr. X, an 
independent expert retained by the College, concluded that Dr. Yazdanfar failed to meet the 
standard of practice of the profession and displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment in 
her performance of large-volume liposuction on Patient A and by failing to appropriately 
recognize and respond to the complications that arose from the procedure. 
 
With respect to Patient B, in July 2009, the College received a letter of complaint regarding a 
breast augmentation Dr. Yazdanfar performed on her in October 2007. Dr. X concluded that Dr. 
Yazdanfar failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession and displayed a lack of 
knowledge, skill and judgment in failing to appropriately respond to the unsatisfactory outcome 
of the breast augmentation procedure.  
 
In addition, Dr. Yazdanfar engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in 
her communications with both patients post-operatively. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:           
      Dr. Yazdanfar appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
       the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Yazdanfar's 
      certificate of registration for an indefinite period: 
 
(a)   Dr. Yazdanfar is restricted from performing all surgery, except as a surgical assistant in a 
      hospital based setting, provided that a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons 
      of Ontario who is approved by the College is in attendance and performing the surgery 
      ("all surgery" includes but is not limited to any cosmetic surgical procedures);   
 
(b)   Dr. Yazdanfar's practice is limited to that of a surgical assistant, as described under (a) 
      above.  
 
(c)   Dr. Yazdanfar shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of her practice and patient 
      charts, conducted at her own expense, by a College representative(s), for the purpose of 
      monitoring and enforcing her compliance with these terms, conditions and limitations; 
      and  
 
(d)   Dr. Yazdanfar shall publish the terms, conditions and limitations imposed on her 
      certificate of registration in any advertisement of her clinic where she is referred to, 
      including on her website, and shall post signage of these restrictions in a form acceptable 
to the College in the Toronto Cosmetic Clinic or any other clinic owned by her. 
 Dr. Yazdanfar to pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of 
the date of this Order. 
              
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 26, 2014


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 May 2011
Summary:

On May 4, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Yazdanfar committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; 
she has contravened the advertising regulation; and, she has engaged in conduct or an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The 
Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Yazdanfar is incompetent. 
 
In respect of the patient KS, Dr. Yazdanfar failed to maintain the standard of practice:   in her 
performance of liposuction; in her post-operative care and treatment; and, in her record keeping. 
Dr. Yazdanfar engaged in unprofessional conduct:  in commencing liposuction on another 
patient while KS was unstable and/or failing to abort the liposuction on the other patient after 
learning of KS unstable and/or deteriorating condition; and, in knowingly breaching the 
acceptable standards of practice with respect to her performance of liposuction 
 
In respect of the patient FM, Dr. Yazdanfar failed to maintain the standard of practice:   in her 
failure to obtain informed consent; in her performance of liposuction; and, in her post-operative 
care and treatment including her discharge arrangements. Dr. Yazdanfar engaged in disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in knowingly breaching the acceptable standards of 
practice with respect to her performance of liposuction. 
 
In respect of the patient MP, Dr. Yazdanfar failed to maintain the standard of practice:   in 
performance of liposuction; and, in post-operative care and treatment. Dr. Yazdanfar engaged in 
unprofessional conduct in knowingly breaching the acceptable standards of practice with respect 
to her performance of liposuction. 
 
In respect of the patient QR, Dr. Yazdanfar failed to maintain the standard of practice and 
engaged in unprofessional conduct:  in failing to obtain informed consent; in failing to provide 
the patient with a proper choice of procedures; in failing to advise the patient that she did not 
perform one of the requested procedures; in failing to adequately advise the patient of increased 
complications with increased implant size; in failing to select, assist the patient in selecting and 
failing to take responsibility for selection of appropriate implant size; and, in offering an 
inappropriate manner of correcting the first operation (using smaller implants in the same 
pocket). 
 
In respect of the patient WX, Dr. Yazdanfar failed to maintain the standard of practice and 
engaged in unprofessional conduct:  in failing to obtain informed consent; in failing to formulate 
an appropriate treatment plan, in that she failed to adequately advise about and explore all 
possible options for dealing with the patient's presenting complaint; in failing to advise the 
patient of increased complications with increased implant size; in failing to select, assist the 
patient in selecting, and failing to take responsibility for selection of the appropriate implant size; 
in failing to make appropriate treatment decisions and recommendations; and, in failing to 
recognize and appropriately manage complications. 
 
In respect of certain patients in her cosmetic surgery practice from 2005-2007, Dr. Yazdanfar 
failed to maintain the standard of practice:   in the performance of liposuction, including 
performance of liposuction in combination with other procedures; in her engagement as a 
co-surgeon in the combination of liposuction and abdominoplasty; in her pre-operative 
evaluations; in failing to obtain informed consent in the patients with co-morbidities; and, in her 
post-operative care and treatment. Dr. Yazdanfar engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional conduct in knowingly breaching acceptable standards in her performance of 
liposuction. 
 
Dr. Yazdanfar contravened the advertising regulation and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable 
or unprofessional conduct through posting advertising on the Toronto Cosmetic Clinic website, 
which is misleading or deceptive and which contains testimonials and/or superlative statements 
about her cosmetic practice. 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Yazdanfar is incompetent in relation to her care of two liposuction 
patients in 2007, certain liposuction patients in her cosmetic surgery practice from 2005 to 2007, 
and in the care of two breast augmentation patients in 2007 and 2008. 
 
On December 21, 2011, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Yazdanfar's certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
      years commencing on the date of this Order. 
 
2.    Dr. Yazdanfar appear before the Committee to be reprimanded, on a date to be fixed by 
      the Committee which shall be no later than three (3) months from the date that this Order 
      becomes final.  
 
3.    The following terms, conditions and limitations be imposed on Dr. Yazdanfar's certificate 
      of registration for an indefinite period: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Yazdanfar is restricted from performing all surgery, except as a surgical 
            assistant in a hospital based setting, provided that a member of the College of 
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario who is approved by the College is in 
            attendance and performing the surgery ("all surgery" includes but is not limited to 
            any cosmetic surgical procedures). 
 
      (b)   Dr. Yazdanfar's practice is limited to that of a surgical assistant, as described 
            under (a). 
 
      (c)   Dr. Yazdanfar shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of her practice and 
            patient charts, conducted at her own expense, by a College representative(s), for 
            the purpose of monitoring and enforcing her compliance with these terms, 
            conditions and limitations. 
       (d)  Dr. Yazdanfar shall publish the terms, conditions and limitation imposed on her 
            certificate of registration in any advertisement of her clinic where she is referred 
            to, including on her website, and shall post signage of these restrictions in a form 
            acceptable to the College in the Toronto Cosmetic Clinic or any other clinic 
            owned by her. 
 
4.    Dr. Yazdanfar pay to the College $219,000 in respect to costs, such costs to be paid 
      within 12 months of the date of this Order. 
 
On January 20, 2012, Dr. Yazdanfar appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the 
Divisional Court.  
 
On April 24, 2012, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Yazdanfar's motion to stay the penalty 
decision of the Discipline Committee pending the outcome of the appeal. Therefore the penalty 
decision remains in effect. 
 
On October 16, 2013, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Yazdanfar's appeal.  
 
On October 31, 2013, Dr. Yazdanfar filed a Notice of Motion for Leave to Appeal the decision of 
the Divisional Court to the Court of Appeal. 
 
On December 27, 2013, Dr. Yazdanfar served a Notice of Abandonment of her Motion for Leave 
to Appeal the decision of the Divisional Court to the Court of Appeal. 
 
On January 28, 2014, the Court of Appeal ordered Dr. Yazdanfar's motion for leave to appeal be 
dismissed for delay with costs in the amount of $750.00. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 20 Jan 2012
Hearing Date(s): Jul 13-17, 22-24, Sep 14-18, 21-22, 30-Oct 2, 2010

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: May 26, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Yazdanfar is not currently registered with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and is not authorized to practise medicine in Ontario. Her certificate of registration expired effective March 5, 2014.

On December 21, 2011 and on May 26, 2014, the College’s Discipline Committee made an order imposing terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Yazdanfar’s certificate of registration, referable to the time she was registered with the College:

(a) Dr. Yazdanfar is restricted from performing all surgery, except as a surgical assistant in a hospital based setting, provided that a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario who is approved by the College is in attendance and performing the surgery ("all surgery" includes but is not limited to any cosmetic surgical procedures);

(b) Dr. Yazdanfar's practice is limited to that of a surgical assistant, as described under (a) above.

(c) Dr. Yazdanfar shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of her practice and patient charts, conducted at her own expense, by a College representative(s), for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing her compliance with these terms, conditions and limitations; and

(d) Dr. Yazdanfar shall publish the terms, conditions and limitations imposed on her certificate of registration in any advertisement of her clinic where she is referred to, including on her website, and shall post signage of these restrictions in a form acceptable to the College in the Toronto Cosmetic Clinic or any other clinic owned by her.