Yazdani, Arjang (CPSO#: 74767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus Site
Department of Plastic Surgery
PO Box 5010 Room E2-647
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8320
Fax: (519) 685-8322
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

281 Oxford St E
London ON  N6A 1V3
Canada
Phone: (519) 601-4554
Fax: (519) 601-4559
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arjang Yazdani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yazdani ( CPSO# 74767 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus Site
Department of Plastic Surgery
Room E2-647
800 Commisioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8320

Business Address:
401 - 746 Baseline Road East
London ON  N6C 5Z2
Phone Number: (519) 601-4554

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARJANG YAZDANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007