Yazdani, Shahin (CPSO#: 70105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Med Team Clinic
Suite 103
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 592-1448
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Temiskaming hosp[ital
421 shepherdson Rd.
temiskaming shores
New Liskeard ON  P0J1P0
Canada
Phone: 1-705-647-8121
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

21 sylvan st.
Kenora ON  P9N3W7
Canada
Phone: 1-807-468-9861
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

211 lake aveE
Carleton Place ON  K7C1J4
Canada
Phone: 613-257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

146 oliver road
Campbellford ON  K0L1L0
Canada
Phone: 1-705-653-1140
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Queensway-Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Yazdani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yazdani ( CPSO# 70105 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
Carleton Place Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
Sudbury ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (704) 647-8121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHIN YAZDANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1997 to 30 Apr 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 1998 to 30 Apr 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999