Yeats, Ashley Bradshaw (CPSO#: 59402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beth Israel Deaconess Hosp-Milton
199 Reedsdale Road
Milton MA  02186
United States
Phone: (617) 313-1054
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Ctr.
One Deaconess Road (W/CC2)
Attn: Gary Shillin
BID-Milton Healthcare Quality
Boston MA  02215
United States
Phone: (617) 754-2349
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Massachusetts


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ASHLEY BRADSHAW YEATS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEATS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989