Yeats, Barbara Anna (CPSO#: 55524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: Schumann, Barbara Anna (used until: 22 Dec 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone: (613) 692-2571
Fax: (613) 692-0271
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Yeats Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Yeats ( CPSO# 55524 )

Business Address:
5230 Mitch Owens Road
P.O. Box 580
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone Number: (613) 692-2571

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ANNA YEATS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEATS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1986