Yechouron, Ariane (CPSO#: 60213)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004