Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Yee, Albert Juang Ming (CPSO#: 65339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M G 371-B
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6815
Fax: (416) 480-4395
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.J.M. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Do ( CPSO# 66717 )
Dr. A. Yee ( CPSO# 65339 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room MG 371-B
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6815

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT JUANG MING YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993