Yee, Allan John (CPSO#: 64054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373 Ext. 6743
Fax: (905) 472-7621
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allan J. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yee ( CPSO# 64054 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (416) 295-6965

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN JOHN YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992