Yee, Chok Ching (CPSO#: 42743)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chok Ching Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit (416) 781-9053 www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017


Address: DOCUdavit Medical Solutions, 1 (888)-781-9083, medicalrecords@docudavit.com
Date Received: 26 Aug 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 9, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Chok Ching Yee to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective March 9, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Yee’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Yee has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.