Yee, Doreen Anna (CPSO#: 51883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue, M-3200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Screening Clinic
340 College Street
Suite 601
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: 416-928-9511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. A. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yee ( CPSO# 51883 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M - 3200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Business Address:
Suite 601
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOREEN ANNA YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1983