Yee, John (CPSO#: 62056)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 18 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Sep 2001