Yee, John (CPSO#: 70233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Family Medicine
10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: (519) 783-0023
Fax: (519) 783-0033
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yee ( CPSO# 70233 )

Business Address:
10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0023

Business Address:
Wilfred Laurier University, Student Health
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Phone Number: (519) 884-0710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998