Yee, Karen Wai Ling (CPSO#: 65443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
610 University Avenue, 700U 6-328
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4495
Fax: (416) 946-4563
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN WAI LING YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993