Yee, Lauren Lise (CPSO#: 58491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 300
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 971-8874
Fax: (519) 971-8672
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lauren Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Yee ( CPSO# 58491 )

Business Address:
South Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 300
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 971-8874

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN LISE YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1988