Yee, Main Chiong (CPSO#: 60731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Fax: (519) 437-6039
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Main Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yee ( CPSO# 60731 )

Business Address:
The Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAIN CHIONG YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991