Yee, Margaret Rose (CPSO#: 63986)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010


Former Name: Dowdy-Yee, Margaret Rose (used until: 09 May 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010