Yee, Raymond (CPSO#: 52122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road, Room C6-114
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Cardiac Institute
Suite 302
256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Canada
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: (519) 645-1584
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yee ( CPSO# 52122 )

Business Address:
302 - 256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone Number: (519) 645-0146

Business Address:
University Hospital
Room C6-114
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3746

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1986