Yee, Stephen Edward (CPSO#: 70561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Davis Drive Medical Clinic
Unit 6
291 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2N6
Phone: (905) 836-6609
Fax: (905) 830-0483
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN EDWARD YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Jun 1996 to 24 Jul 1996
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 1996 to 16 Oct 1996
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1997