Yegappan, Muthiah Chidambaram (CPSO#: 72143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St.Joseph Health Care
NeuroDiagnostic Clinic-Lower Level
100 West 5th St
Hamilton ON  L8P 3R2
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 39980
Fax: (905) 3815670
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Neuroambulatory Centre
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L2X2
Canada
Phone: 9055274322 Ext. 46755
Fax: 9055778016
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yegappan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 14 2014


Corporation Name: C. & M. Yegappan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yegappan ( CPSO# 72143 )
Dr. M. Yegappan ( CPSO# 72064 )

Business Address:
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Suite 104
140 Niagara Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4L4
Phone Number: (905) 988-6008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUTHIAH CHIDAMBARAM YEGAPPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEGAPPAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 07 Aug 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1998