Yeh, Henry Heng (CPSO#: 22315)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005