Yeh, Louis Sheling (CPSO#: 62477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1943A Victoria Park Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1R 1V1
Phone: (416) 445-1754
Fax: (416) 445-1754
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louis S. Yeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Yeh ( CPSO# 62477 )

Business Address:
1943A Victoria Park Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1R 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 445-1754

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS SHELING YEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991