Yelenbaugen, Irina (CPSO#: 51980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Healthy Way
Suite 105
1120 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 3H7
Phone: (416) 667-8498
Fax: (416) 667-8478
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irina Yelenbaugen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Yelenbaugen ( CPSO# 51980 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
1120 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 3H7
Phone Number: (416) 667-8498

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRINA YELENBAUGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YELENBAUGEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1985