Yelle, Carole-Anne Lucie (CPSO#: 71645)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 25 Jul 1997
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2006