Yelle, Robert Michel (CPSO#: 68434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridlewood Medical Centre
64 Stonehaven Drive
Kanata ON  K2M 2Y2
Phone: (613) 592-0805
Fax: (613) 592-0961
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert M. Yelle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yelle ( CPSO# 68434 )

Business Address:
Bridlewood Medical Centre
64 Stonehaven Drive
Kanata ON  K2S 2H3
Phone Number: (613) 592-0805

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHEL YELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YELLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1996