Yellin, Joel (CPSO#: 52806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite M1
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone: (905) 529-5221
Fax: (905) 546-0361
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Yellin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yellin ( CPSO# 52806 )

Business Address:
M1 - 414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 529-5221


Corporation Name: Sandra Seigel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yellin ( CPSO# 52806 )
Dr. S. Seigel ( CPSO# 57016 )

Business Address:
Lower Level
107 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone Number: (905) 628-0054

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL YELLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YELLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985