Yen, David (CPSO#: 55765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Douglas 5
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2545
Fax: (613) 548-2518
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Yen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yen ( CPSO# 55765 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2545

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID YEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1986