Yen, Ziny Chi (CPSO#: 91179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CDK Family Medicine
175 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1A9
Phone: (613) 766-0318
Fax: (613) 766-0339
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ziny Yen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Yen ( CPSO# 91179 )

Business Address:
CDK Family Medicine
175 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1A9
Phone Number: (613) 766-0318

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZINY CHI YEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011